Minutes from a general membership meeting held on January 29, 1976
- MS-3-35, Box 18, Folder 10, Item 45
- Item
- January 29, 1976
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
138 results with digital objects Show results with digital objects
Minutes from a general membership meeting held on January 29, 1976
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a general members meeting held on October 16, 1975
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board of Directors meeting that happened on September 27, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a board of directors meeting held on May 4, 1976
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board of Directors meeting held on March 24, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board of Directors meeting held on January 29, 1976
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Item is a Board of Directors meeting minutes at Eye Level Gallery. Members present includes Roger Savage, John Greer, Peter Leverman, Joyce Hanson, Karl MacKeeman and Garry Conway. The board accepted the resignations of Ron Shuebrook, Michael Fernandes and Janet Dunbrack. Other items discussed included: opening of a new bank account, funds to send Gary Conway to a conference on alternative galleries in Ottawa, and a motion to charge 30% commission on the sale of artwork. Roger Savage provided a financial report.
Item also includes a resignation letter by Keith Laws from the Director of the Gallery position from January 29, 1976.
Minutes from a Board meeting held on September 25, 1975
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a board meeting held on November 27, 1975
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board meeting held on May 30, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a board meeting held on March 3, 1977
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board meeting held on June 7, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board meeting held on June 14, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes from a Board meeting held on August 28, 1975
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes for the Board of Directors
Part of Halifax Camerata Singers fonds
Minutes for the Board of Directors
Part of Halifax Camerata Singers fonds
Minutes for Board of Directors meeting held on March 2, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes and reports for the Board of Directors
Part of Halifax Camerata Singers fonds
Minutes and report from Board meeting held on February 9, 1983
Part of Eyelevel Gallery fonds
Minutes and other records of the Board of Directors
Part of Halifax Camerata Singers fonds
Stirling, William Alexander, Earl of, 1567 or 1568-1640
Minute books of the Sons of Temperance, Victoria Lodge No. 13
Sons of Temperance, Victoria Lodge Division No. 13.
Minute books of the Dalhousie Co-vettes
Dalhousie Co-vettes
Ladies' Aid Society of Central Presbyterian Church, La Have, Nova Scotia.
Minute book of the standing committee of the Dalhousie-King's Faculty Teas
Dalhousie-King's Faculty Teas' Standing Committee.
Minute book of the Sons of Temperance, Wallace Bridge Division No. 792
Sons of Temperance, Wallace Bridge Division No. 792.
Minute book of the Sons of Temperance, Rock Division
Sons of Temperance, Rock Division.
Minute book of the Sons of Temperance, Columbia Division No. 24
Sons of Temperance, Columbia Division No. 24.
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute book of the Medical Relief Committee of Dartmouth
Halifax Medical Commission Relief Committees
Minute book of the Executive of the Alumni Association of Dalhousie College and University
Minute book of the Chester Hotels Limited
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Chester Hotels Limited.
Minute book of meetings of the Board of Directors of Seahorse Investments Limited
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Seahorse Investments Limited.
Minute Book of meetings of the Board of Directors of Oland and Sons/Lindwood Holdings Ltd.
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute Book of meetings of the Board of Directors of Lindwood Holdings Ltd (New Brunswick)
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Lindwood Holdings Limited.
Minute Book of meetings of the Board of Directors of Lindwood Holdings Ltd.
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Lindwood Holdings Limited.
Minute book of Kendall Converters Limited 1925-1926
Part of National Fish Company Limited
Minute Book of Directors and Register of shareholders for the Oland's Brewers' Grain & Yeast Limited
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Oland's Brewers Grain and Yeast.
Minute book for the Trustees of the Pension Fund of Oland & Son Limited and affiliated companies
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute book for the meetings of the Oland Investments Limited for 1976 to 1985
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute book for the meetings of the Oland Investments Limited
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Oland Investments Limited.
Minute book for the meetings of the Directors of A. Keith & Son Limited for 1979
Part of Oland and Son fonds
A. Keith and Son Limited
Minute book for the meetings of the Directors of A. Keith & Son Limited for 1948 to 1978
Part of Oland and Son fonds
A. Keith and Son Limited
Minute book for the meeting of the Directors of Oland & Son Limited for 1957 to 1965
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute book for the meeting of the Directors of Oland & Son Limited for 1947 to 1956
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Minute book for the meeting of the Directors of Oland & Son Limited for 1915 to 1938
Part of Oland and Son fonds
Oland and Son Limited
Minute Book for the Governing Board of the Nova Scotia Technical College
Minute Book for the Governing Board of the Nova Scotia Technical College
Minute book for Sons of Temperance, Chester Division, 1869-1880
Minute book for Sons for Temperance, Chester Division, 1867-1869
Minute and account books of the Bridgewater Lawn and Tennis Club
Bridgewater Lawn and Tennis Club.